Trustees MARY LIDSTONE TRUST

Charity number: 1143031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Colin James Evans Trustee 21 October 2016
None on record
Alan Michael Salt Trustee 10 July 2014
None on record
ANNE ELIZABETH STEPHENS Trustee 04 February 2013
None on record
PAUL ANDREW COLLINGS Trustee 13 November 2012
None on record
CHARLIE STEPHENS Trustee 22 July 2011
None on record