Financial history REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD: HOUSE ON THE ROCK

Charity number: 1141896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £16.55k £14.40k £11.42k £7.02k £8.41k
Total expenditure £18.94k £14.84k £11.45k £5.23k £4.28k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A