BILL QUAY COMMUNITY FARM ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1146471
Charity reporting is up to date (34 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 March 2021 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 March 2021 34 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 16 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 06 October 2018 248 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 06 October 2018 248 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 02 February 2017 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 02 February 2017 2 days late Download