THE HINCKLEY CONCORDIA ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 501904
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 05 June 2020 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 05 June 2020 5 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 17 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 17 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 28 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 28 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 24 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 24 May 2017 On time Download