THE HINCKLEY CONCORDIA ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 501904

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SARAH JANE BOLTON Trustee 29 November 2017 None on record
ZOE ELIZABETH STOKES Trustee 29 November 2017 None on record
WILLIAM ANTHONY HARE Chair 12 November 2017 None on record
CLAIRE PITT Trustee 09 November 2014
SPANNED - SUPPORTING PEOPLE WITH ADDITIONAL NEEDS IN THE NOTTINGHAM DIOCESE Overdue by 88 days
Emma-Jayne Gladman Trustee 16 December 2019 None on record
IAN SHIPLEY Trustee None on record
Robert John Gladman Trustee 11 November 2018 None on record
DOROTHY JOAN HEWITT Trustee None on record
MRS JUDY PEATFIELD Trustee None on record
JENNIFER ANN HAWKINS Trustee 12 November 2017 None on record
MR JAMES FISHER Trustee 03 February 2014 None on record
ANDREW DAVID CHAMBERLAIN Trustee 12 November 2017 None on record
RICHARD CRADDOCK Trustee 12 November 2017 None on record