Accounts and annual returns ORION SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1145038
Charity reporting is overdue by 26 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 26 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 26 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 April 2021 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 April 2021 66 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window