BRITISH MATERNAL AND FETAL MEDICINE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1145101
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 23 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 23 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2019 28 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 28 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 31 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2017 02 December 2017 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 02 December 2017 2 days late Download
Annual return 31 January 2016 23 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 23 November 2016 On time Download