BRITISH MATERNAL AND FETAL MEDICINE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1145101
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £53.36k £60.11k £86.01k £135.70k £64.13k
Total expenditure £145.16k £22.62k £133.43k £103.88k £24.77k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A