Accounts and annual returns EARTH CHAMPIONS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1143634
Charity reporting is overdue by 86 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 86 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 86 days
Annual return 31 May 2022 27 February 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 27 February 2023 333 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 10 December 2021 254 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 26 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required