Financial history EARTH CHAMPIONS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1143634
Charity reporting is overdue by 81 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £11.50k £9.79k £12.07k £3.41k £0
Total expenditure £15.27k £9.90k £15.51k £3.60k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A