BRIGHT FUTURE WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1142867
Charity reporting is overdue by 236 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 236 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 236 days
Annual return 30 April 2019 17 July 2020 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 17 July 2020 505 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 06 June 2020 829 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 06 June 2020 1194 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required