BRIGHT FUTURE WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1142867
Charity reporting is overdue by 208 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2013 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019
Total gross income £500 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £500 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A