THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WALCOT, BATH

Charity number: 1142099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rebecca Armstrong Trustee 28 September 2016 None on record
Melanie Wortham Trustee 14 April 2019 None on record
Rev Tim Gleghorn Chair 12 January 2017
FUNDS HELD IN CONNECTION WITH CHRIST CHURCH IN BATH Received: On time
Brenda Carter Trustee 14 April 2019 None on record
Laura Gracey Trustee 13 September 2020 None on record
Dan Darwin Trustee 09 May 2021 None on record
Paul Brewster Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
Amanda Aston Trustee 14 April 2019 None on record
Mike Banner Trustee 14 April 2019 None on record
Catherine Harrison-Smith Trustee 09 May 2021 None on record
Rev Fran Youings Trustee 23 June 2019 None on record