THE OHMI TRUST

Charity number: 1143623
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 22 December 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 12 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 20 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 19 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 19 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 14 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 14 December 2017 On time Download