Accounts and annual returns GREEN TEMPLETON COLLEGE

Charity number: 1142297
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 15 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 15 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 27 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 13 August 2020 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 13 August 2020 74 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 22 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 22 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 07 November 2018 160 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 07 November 2018 160 days late Download Open in new window