LIFTON COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds to add solar panels to Lifton Community Centre and to add a third meeting room. Also hiring the hall out to clubs, organisations and parties for a variety of activities to serve the village of Lifton and the surrounding area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 13 April 2012: Standard registration
- 17 October 2012: Funds received from 1050975 LIFTON SOCIAL AND COMMUNITY CENTRE
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Maxine Alexander | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM BURNS GLEN | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Michelle Grenney | Trustee | 21 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Philip Francis Cleary | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE LEWIS | Trustee | 27 November 2012 |
|
|||||
ROGER BRUCE CHEVES | Trustee | 15 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
LAVINIA GAY MARSHALL | Trustee | 15 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOHN NELSON DYKE | Trustee | 15 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.36k | £15.47k | £24.62k | £27.18k | £25.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.99k | £29.20k | £10.86k | £27.13k | £36.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £11.00k | £10.67k | £10.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05/03/2012
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF LIFTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Hornapark Close
LIFTON
Devon
PL16 0BE
- Phone:
- 01566784513
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window