UNIVERSITY OF BATH STUDENTS' UNION (BUSU)

Charity number: 1143154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 22 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 22 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 29 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 29 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 05 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 05 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 15 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 15 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 11 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 11 May 2017 On time Download