Financial history UNIVERSITY OF BATH STUDENTS' UNION (BUSU)

Charity number: 1143154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £4.97m £5.05m £4.44m £3.47m £5.56m
Total expenditure £5.02m £5.18m £4.60m £3.50m £5.32m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £5.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £45.00k £50.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.13m £2.13m £2.28m £3.04m £2.92m
Income - Other trading activities £184.02k £177.92k £42.97k £20.23k £193.32k
Income - Charitable activities £2.66m £2.74m £2.11m £411.81k £2.45m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.66k £3.86k £3.04k £89 £527
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.72m £4.97m £4.55m £3.46m £5.22m
Expenditure - Raising funds £281.16k £204.20k £36.97k £23.28k £76.60k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £9.80k £10.05k £10.60k £15.45k £17.50k