Trustees UNIVERSITY OF BATH STUDENTS' UNION (BUSU)
Charity number: 1143154

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Robinson | Chair | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Leigh Board | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Bernard John Morley | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anand Aggarwal | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Blake Walker | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Viktor Toshev | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jura Neverauskaite | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Houghton | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Kildyushova | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barry Hughes | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Stacey | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jordan Kenny | Trustee | 19 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARIAN MCNEIR MBE | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.