Accounts and annual returns Swan Youth Project (Norfolk) Ltd

Charity number: 1143957
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 12 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 March 2020 398 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 11 February 2021 742 days late Download Open in new window