WIMBLEDON GREYHOUND WELFARE

Charity number: 1142777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £726.08k £247.65k £400.48k £284.77k £323.83k
Total expenditure £264.59k £269.37k £252.85k £258.86k £210.41k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £654.11k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £18.13k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £52.66k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £1.18k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £470.78k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £245.02k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £19.57k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £2.28k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A