WIMBLEDON GREYHOUND WELFARE

Charity number: 1142777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert Stephen Ball Trustee 24 October 2020 None on record
Simon Jordan Trustee 28 May 2014 None on record
Carol Marshall Trustee 20 August 2017 None on record
Gaynor Elizabeth Renwick Trustee 22 October 2017 None on record
KEITH ROBBINS Trustee 26 July 2012 None on record
NORA MCELLSTRIM Trustee 01 August 2012 None on record