Financial history WORLD FOR LIBYA

Charity number: 1142409
Charity reporting is overdue by 308 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £1.46k £350 £30 £50.01k £0
Total expenditure £950 £72 £126.88k £100 £588
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A