Trustees QUINTESSENTIALLY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1144584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rory Brooks Chair 01 January 2021
None on record
Emma Rebecca McCarthy Trustee 27 January 2016
None on record
Andrew George Crawley Trustee 27 January 2016
None on record
Sebastian Lee Trustee 24 March 2014
None on record
BENJAMIN ELLIOT Trustee 09 November 2011
None on record
Dr PETER CROWTHER Trustee 27 May 2011
None on record