AL-MAHDI FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1146363
Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 March 2021 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 March 2021 52 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 09 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 January 2017 On time Download