Accounts and annual returns SOUTH EAST WALES RIVERS TRUST

Charity number: 1145724
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 15 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 27 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window