SAFE! SUPPORT FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AFFECTED BY CRIME

Charity number: 1143532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 19 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 15 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 05 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 05 November 2016 On time Download