SAFE! SUPPORT FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AFFECTED BY CRIME

Charity number: 1143532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £440.26k £524.79k £579.78k £613.79k £847.57k
Total expenditure £475.03k £516.96k £555.43k £624.23k £797.82k
Income from government contracts £382.02k £394.45k £436.00k £466.08k £513.62k
Income from government grants £0 N/A £75.00k N/A £68.51k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £23.80k £10.61k £6.18k £5.84k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £738 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £494.03k £568.44k £607.62k £841.61k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £6.96k £0 £0 £121
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £516.57k £554.52k £623.85k £796.35k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £389 £907 £372 £1.48k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £900 £0 £1.26k £1.22k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0