SAFE! SUPPORT FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AFFECTED BY CRIME

Charity number: 1143532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RAYMOND EDWARD HIPKIN Trustee 24 November 2020 None on record
SARAH BRETON Trustee 25 February 2020 None on record
Elizabeth Jones Chair 15 June 2015
CIRCLES SOUTH EAST Received: On time
ADVOCACY AFTER FATAL DOMESTIC ABUSE Received: On time
ELMORE COMMUNITY SERVICES Received: On time
ADVOCACY AFTER FATAL DOMESTIC ABUSE LTD Received: On time
Nadia Marie Wager Trustee 04 July 2016 None on record
DR MATT LISTER Trustee 25 March 2015 None on record
JOSEPHINE RUTH BROWN BSC Trustee 24 August 2011 None on record
KAREN CUSHING Trustee 24 August 2011 None on record
Michael Watkinson MBE Trustee 01 January 2014
OXFORDSHIRE YOUTH Received: On time
SUSAN DAVIE Trustee 29 June 2021 None on record
PETER BENEDICT WALLIS Trustee 24 August 2011 None on record
SIMON ANTONY CLEMENTS Trustee 14 September 2021 None on record
JERMAINE SMITH Trustee 25 February 2020 None on record
TRACEY ANNE MARIE LAWRENCE Trustee 18 May 2016 None on record