KHOO TECK PUAT UK FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1142788
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 31 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 31 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 07 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 07 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 28 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 28 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 11 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 11 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 23 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 23 February 2017 On time Download