THE ABBEYFIELD (RIPON AND DISTRICT) SOCIETY LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supported sheltered housing for elderly
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 24 January 1973: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Anne Nichols | Chair | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Alexander Ward | Trustee | 10 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Derek Stephens | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Taylor | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Allon-Smith | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janice Marie Sherwood | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janette Mary Newman | Trustee | 19 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Ann Bailey Mrs | Trustee | 13 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.45k | £103.55k | £113.28k | £121.14k | £128.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £118.21k | £119.97k | £146.80k | £140.60k | £172.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2023
(These accounts |
25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 18 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 18 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 AUGUST 1972
Charitable objects
TJE RELIEF AND CARE OF ELDERLY PERSONS OF ALL CLASSES SUFFERING FROM THE DISABILITIES OF OLD AGE OR OTHERWISE IN NEED.FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
RIPON AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
ABBEYFIELD HOUSE
CHURCH LANE
RIPON
NORTH YORKSHIRE
HG4 2ES
- Phone:
- 01765605446
- Email:
- INFO@ABBEYFIELDRIPON.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window