Uncurbed Collective

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A member-led organisation creating innovative, thought-provoking performance primarily to raise greater awareness and understanding of a variety of social and cultural issues from a disability perspective. Providing opportunities for training, confidence building & meaningful social interaction to reduce social isolation and signposting to other in/formal learning and employment opportunities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 23 September 2011: Standard registration
- 28 November 2012: Funds received from 1134184 PROUD AND LOUD ARTS
- PROUD & LOUD ARTS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Baidoo | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Simon Philip Ruding | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Hanaa Skalli | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tamsin Drury | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dean Smalley | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Butler | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JANET CHARLESWORTH | Trustee | 20 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
KELLY HOYE | Trustee | 20 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.92k | £219.66k | £143.49k | £91.81k | £272.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.94k | £116.36k | £153.96k | £132.69k | £254.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 AUG 2018 as amended on 20 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE FIELD OF ART AND TO DEVELOP THEIR KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART OF DRAMA. TO HELP MEET THE NEEDS OF DISABLED PEOPLE BY PROVIDING THEM WITH THE ABILITY TO EXPRESS THEMSELVES IN A CREATIVE CONTEXT. TO HELP DISABLED PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.?
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Edge Fold Crescent
Worsley
Salford
M28 7EX
- Phone:
- 07876798319
- Email:
- proudandloudarts@ukart.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window