Accounts and annual returns SHU TRUST

Charity number: 1142910
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 18 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 10 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 17 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 13 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 22 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required