Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HEDGE END ST LUKE

Charity number: 1142990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 12 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 26 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 30 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window