Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HEDGE END ST LUKE

Charity number: 1142990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £102.80k £94.88k £121.70k £82.94k £82.47k
Total expenditure £103.97k £97.37k £98.70k £69.79k £67.14k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £400 N/A N/A N/A N/A