Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HEDGE END ST LUKE

Charity number: 1142990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Janet Compton Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Alastair James Dobson Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Rev Benjamin Jones Trustee 16 September 2021
None on record
Rev Elizabeth Vera Williams Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
CHRIS DUFF Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Karen Cotton Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Sandra Plaw Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Jenny Little Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Joyce Lynas Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
ROGER SPINK Trustee 22 April 2015
None on record
MARTIN JONATHAN PHILLIPS Trustee 06 April 2014
None on record