Trustees READ DANCE AND THEATRE COLLEGE
Charity number: 1142899

Charity is insolvent
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Malcolm Campbell | Chair | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Serena Tajima | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Cole | Trustee | 17 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
JAN FERRER | Trustee | 26 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROGER CLIVE MISSING | Trustee | 15 July 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.