RESCUE WOODEN BOATS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To acquire, restore, preserve, maintain display and use for public benefit, heritage wooden boats and other wooden maritime vessels and so advance public education in the historical significance of such boats and vessels and the skills and crafts used in their construction, maintenance and use.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £9,716 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 07 October 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Joseph Keyte | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Helen West | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robin Henry West | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Ann Witherby Pritchard | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kurt William Janson | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Christopher Lucan McRitchie Pratt | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
William Darby | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|||||
George Parry | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Henry Robert Easter Faire | Trustee | 07 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Simon Garnier | Trustee | 08 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
David Hewittt | Trustee | 07 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.68k | £16.92k | £16.92k | £14.68k | £31.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.75k | £18.78k | £18.78k | £16.85k | £25.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £9.72k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 07/06/2011
Charitable objects
TO ACQUIRE, RESTORE, PRESERVE, MAINTAIN, DISPLAY AND USE FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT, HERITAGE WOODEN BOATS AND OTHER WOODEN MARITIME VESSELS AND SO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE HISTORICAL SIGNIFICANCE OF SUCH BOATS AND VESSELS AND THE SKILLS AND CRAFTS USED IN THEIR CONSTRUCTION, MAINTENANCE AND USE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Craymere Beck House
Craymere Beck Road
Thurning
Melton Constable
NR24 2LN
- Phone:
- 01263860854
- Email:
- info@rescuewoodenboats.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window