BURAQSUPPORT LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the advancement of the islamic faith by providing access and inclusion of disabled people within the muslim community. By providing advice, support and equip Mosques and Islamic events.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
Governance
- 21 September 2011: Standard registration
- 09 July 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 12 June 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 12 June 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 12 June 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 12 June 2012 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/07/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/07/2011
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, SUPPORT AND OTHER SERVICES TO DISABLED PEOPLE IN ORDER TO MAKE ACCESSIBLE FOR THEM THE ANNUAL HAJJ PILGRIMAGE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window