Accounts and annual returns FASHION ARTS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1147729
Charity reporting is overdue by 125 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 125 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 125 days
Annual return 30 April 2020 15 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 02 April 2020 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 03 May 2019 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 27 March 2018 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 27 March 2018 27 days late Download Open in new window