Financial history FASHION ARTS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1147729
Charity reporting is overdue by 126 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £0 £84.27k £21.20k £2.00k £0
Total expenditure £1.69k £92.15k £102.68k £12.88k £31.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A