Financial history DURHAM AMATEUR FOOTBALL TRUST

Charity number: 1145088
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £3.13k £2.03k £1.14k £1.70k £11.54k
Total expenditure £1.33k £861 £1.55k £1.06k £1.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £750