Accounts and annual returns ELIMU FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1143540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 30 March 2023 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 21 July 2022 166 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 30 March 2021 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 30 March 2021 419 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 30 March 2021 784 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required