UWE STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1143067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £5.91m £6.05m £6.18m £6.04m £5.53m
Total expenditure £5.99m £6.92m £5.94m £6.28m £5.50m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A £419.39k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.32m £1.49m £1.51m £1.52m £1.59m
Income - Other trading activities £650.94k £612.53k £562.03k £625.95k £449.57k
Income - Charitable activities £3.93m £3.95m £4.11m £3.89m £3.50m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.42k £484 £105 £373 £579
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.22m £6.16m £5.25m £5.57m £4.89m
Expenditure - Raising funds £761.60k £765.62k £689.53k £707.17k £611.02k
Expenditure - Governance £25.67k £47.32k £58.43k £0 £49.39k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0