UWE STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1143067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kieran James Woodhouse Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
CHRISTOPHER CLEMENTS Trustee 26 April 2015 None on record
Rania Regaieg Trustee 25 June 2021 None on record
Leslie Redwood Trustee 26 June 2018 None on record
Oluwadamilola Okeyoyin Trustee 25 June 2021 None on record
Samuel Ipke Trustee 24 June 2020 None on record
Helen Balmer Trustee 22 October 2019 None on record
Molly Harris Trustee 25 June 2021 None on record
Evan Botwood Trustee 25 June 2021 None on record