Accounts and annual returns RISE COMMUNITY ACTION

Charity number: 1147332
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2021 29 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 29 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 24 November 2021 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 24 November 2021 55 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 29 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 29 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2018 22 January 2020 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 22 January 2020 114 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2017 26 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 26 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window