RISE COMMUNITY ACTION

Charity number: 1147332
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2015 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019
Total gross income £15.27k £14.53k £38.21k £37.98k £35.57k
Total expenditure £5.19k £23.13k £26.92k £39.23k £37.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £9.40k £3.45k N/A N/A