CAMBRIDGE ROAD ESTATES COMMUNITY GROUP ( CREST)

Charity number: 1144268
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 12 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 22 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 23 February 2020 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 28 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 04 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required