FRIENDS OF ST. MARY'S NETHERBURY

Charity number: 1147441
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 16 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 23 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 12 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 05 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 09 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required