FRIENDS OF ST. MARY'S NETHERBURY

Charity number: 1147441
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jacqueline Bush Chair 19 November 2011
NETHERBURY VILLAGE HALL Received: On time
Morag Helen Simpson Curtis Trustee 30 October 2019 None on record
Patricia Wilson Trustee 03 May 2018 None on record
ROGER MILES Trustee 12 September 2013 None on record
WENDY SCHWEGMANN Trustee 07 May 2014 None on record
GLENN YORKE SPENCE BISHOP Trustee 19 November 2011 None on record
ELIZABETH DIANA DACRES FINDLAY BA HONS Trustee 19 November 2011 None on record